PA HB406 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 27, 2006 (1st Sp.Sess., P.L.1873, No.1), known as the Taxpayer Relief Act, in senior citizens property tax and rent rebate assistance, further providing for definitions and for filing of claim.
Title
In senior citizens property tax and rent rebate assistance, further providing for definitions and for filing of claim.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-09-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-19 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2018-06-19 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred to FINANCE |