PA HB40 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in boards and offices, providing for information technology; establishing the Office of Information Technology and the Information Technology Fund; providing for administrative and procurement procedures and for the Joint Cybersecurity Oversight Committee; imposing duties on the Office of Information Technology; providing for administration of Pennsylvania Statewide Radio Network and imposing penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In boards and offices, providing for information technology; establishing the Office of Information Technology and the Information Technology Fund; providing for administrative and procurement procedures and for the Joint Cybersecurity Oversight Committee; imposing duties on the Office of Information Technology; providing for administration of Pennsylvania Statewide Radio Network and imposing penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-27 - House - House State Government: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00192 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House State Government: To Table A00192 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-27 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00168 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07HouseLaid on the table
2021-04-07HouseRemoved from table
2021-01-27HouseLaid on the table
2021-01-27HouseFirst consideration
2021-01-27HouseReported as amended
2021-01-11HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=40
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0040&pn=0019
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0040&pn=0280
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2021&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=0040&pn=0019&aYear=2021&an=00192
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=01/27/2021&RollCallId=48
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=01/27/2021&RollCallId=49
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=01/27/2021&RollCallId=50
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=01/27/2021&RollCallId=51

Bill Comments

feedback