PA HB40 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-10)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Act No. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-10)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Act No. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 26, 1947 (P.L.318, No.140), known as the CPA Law, further providing for certificate requirements, for equivalency practice for individuals and for equivalency practice for firms and entities.
Title
Further providing for certificate requirements, for equivalency practice for individuals and for equivalency practice for firms and entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-10 - Senate - HB 40 PN 538, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - HB 40 PN 538, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - HB 40 PN 538, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | Senate | Act No. 15 |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Signed in House |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-05-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2013-03-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-03-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2013-03-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-03-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-03-19 | House | Second consideration |
2013-03-18 | House | Removed from table |
2013-03-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-03-13 | House | First consideration |
2013-03-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-02-05 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |