PA HB398 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in Commonwealth budget procedures, providing for essential service payments during budget impasse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Commonwealth budget procedures, providing for essential service payments during budget impasse.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-22 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A00487 (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A00218 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-24HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-24HouseRemoved from table
2017-03-22HouseLaid on the table
2017-03-22HouseFirst consideration
2017-03-22HouseReported as amended
2017-02-08HouseReferred to HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=398
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0398&pn=0410
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0398&pn=1053
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=56&theDate=03/22/2017&RollCallId=133
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=56&theDate=03/22/2017&RollCallId=134
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=56&theDate=03/22/2017&RollCallId=132

Bill Comments 750

feedback