PA HB398 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-12 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of July 7, 1980 (P.L.380, No.97), known as the Solid Waste Management Act, in residual waste, further providing for transportation of residual waste; and abrogating a regulation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In residual waste, further providing for transportation of residual waste; and abrogating a regulation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 398 PN 1691, FP (Y: 176 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Floor: HB 398 PN 435, 2015 A1725, VITALI (Y: 78 N: 117 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-06-02 - House - House Floor: HB 398 PN 435, 2015 A1657, KILLION (Y: 182 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: To Table (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: To Table (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-12SenateReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
2015-06-08SenateIn the Senate
2015-06-08HouseThird consideration and final passage (176-12)
2015-06-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2015-06-02HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2015-06-02HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2015-06-01HouseRemoved from table
2015-04-22HouseLaid on the table
2015-04-22HouseFirst consideration
2015-04-22HouseReported as committed
2015-02-09HouseReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2015&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=398
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0398&pn=0435
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0398&pn=1691
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=8&theDate=04/22/2015&rNbr=275
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=8&theDate=04/22/2015&rNbr=274
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=370
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=371
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=388
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/08/2015&rNbr=478
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=8&theDate=04/22/2015&RollCallId=274
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=8&theDate=04/22/2015&RollCallId=275
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/08/2015&RollCallId=478

Bill Comments 750

feedback