PA HB398 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-20)
Status: Passed on February 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-02 - Act No. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An Act providing for registration of appraisal management companies, for powers of the State Board of Certified Real Estate Appraisers with respect to appraisal management companies, for the responsibilities and duties of appraisal management companies, for prohibited activities, for discipline and for penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for registration of appraisal management companies, for powers of the State Board of Certified Real Estate Appraisers with respect to appraisal management companies, for the responsibilities and duties of appraisal management companies, for prohibited activities, for discipline and for penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-01-23 - House - HB 398 PN 2633, CONCUR (Y: 190 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - HB 398 PN 2633, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-12 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-25 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - House - HB 398 PN 1446, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 189 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-02HouseAct No. 4
2012-02-02HouseApproved by the Governor
2012-01-25HousePresented to the Governor
2012-01-24HouseSigned in Senate
2012-01-24HouseSigned in House
2012-01-23HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (190-4)
2012-01-23HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2012-01-23HouseReferred to RULES
2012-01-18HouseIn the House
2012-01-18SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2011-12-13SenateSecond consideration
2011-12-12SenateRe-reported as committed
2011-11-16SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2011-10-25SenateFirst consideration
2011-10-25SenateReported as amended
2011-05-06SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2011-05-02SenateIn the Senate
2011-05-02HouseThird consideration and final passage (189-5)
2011-05-02HouseRe-reported as committed
2011-04-27HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2011-04-27HouseSecond consideration
2011-04-26HouseRemoved from table
2011-04-06HouseLaid on the table
2011-04-06HouseFirst consideration
2011-04-06HouseReported as amended
2011-02-02HouseReferred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2011&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=398
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0398&pn=0364
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0398&pn=1446
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0398&pn=2633
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=263
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2011&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=7&theDate=10/25/2011&rNbr=590
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2011&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=12/12/2011&rNbr=714
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=492
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1071

Bill Comments 750

feedback