PA HB397 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-9)
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-28 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in incentives for municipal volunteers of fire companies and nonprofit emergency medical services agencies, further providing for rejection and appeal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In incentives for municipal volunteers of fire companies and nonprofit emergency medical services agencies, further providing for rejection and appeal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - House - House Floor: HB 397 PN 371, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-28SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2021-10-27SenateIn the Senate
2021-10-27HouseThird consideration and final passage (199-0)
2021-10-27HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-10-26HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-10-26HouseSecond consideration
2021-10-25HouseRemoved from table
2021-10-06HouseLaid on the table
2021-10-06HouseFirst consideration
2021-10-06HouseReported as committed
2021-02-04HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback