PA HB396 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 18, 2001 (P.L.949, No.114), known as the Workforce Development Act, in local workforce investment areas and boards, further providing for membership.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In local workforce investment areas and boards, further providing for membership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Floor: HB 396 PN 860, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00150 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2019-03-20SenateIn the Senate
2019-03-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (194-0)
2019-03-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-03-19HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-19HouseSecond consideration
2019-03-18HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-11HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-11HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-11HouseReported as amended
2019-03-06HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=396
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0396&pn=0747
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0396&pn=0860
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=03/11/2019&RollCallId=73
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=03/11/2019&RollCallId=74
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=109
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/20/2019&RollCallId=163

Bill Comments

feedback