PA HB395 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 27, 2014 (P.L.2911, No.191), known as the Achieving Better Care by Monitoring All Prescriptions Program (ABC-MAP) Act, further providing for requirements for prescribers.
Title
Further providing for requirements for prescribers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Floor: HB 395 PN 1564, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Floor: HB 395 PN 407, 2017 A940, KEEFER (Y: 191 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Floor: HB 395 PN 1564, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Floor: HB 395 PN 407, 2017 A940, KEEFER (Y: 191 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2017-04-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-0) |
2017-04-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-04-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-04-25 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-04-19 | House | Removed from table |
2017-03-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-03-13 | House | First consideration |
2017-03-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |