PA HB39 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, providing for miscellaneous provisions and for recovery audits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for miscellaneous provisions and for recovery audits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Floor: HB 39 PN 1188, FP (Y: 111 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Floor: HB 39 PN 1043, 2021 A664, GROVE (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Floor: HB 39 PN 1043, 2021 A653, BRADFORD (Y: 90 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-24 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00522 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-09SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2021-04-07SenateIn the Senate
2021-04-07HouseFinal passage (111-90)
2021-04-07HouseThird consideration, with amendments
2021-04-07HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-04-06HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-04-06HouseSecond consideration
2021-04-05HouseRemoved from table
2021-03-24HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-24HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-24HouseReported as amended
2021-01-11HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=39
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0039&pn=0018
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0039&pn=1043
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0039&pn=1188
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0039P1043.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=03/24/2021&RollCallId=220
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=03/24/2021&RollCallId=221
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=122
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=144
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=145
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/07/2021&RollCallId=280

Bill Comments 750

feedback