PA HB389 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-14)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-20 - Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE
Pending: Senate Public Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-20 - Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE
Pending: Senate Public Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 27, 1905 (P.L.312, No.218), entitled "An act creating a Department of Health, and defining its powers and duties," establishing the office of Chief Nursing Officer of the Commonwealth and providing for its powers and duties.
Title
Amending the act of April 27, 1905 (P.L.312, No.218), entitled "An act creating a Department of Health, and defining its powers and duties," establishing the office of Chief Nursing Officer of the Commonwealth and providing for its powers and duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Floor: HB 389 PN 1474, FP (Y: 187 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Floor: HB 389 PN 1236, 2015 A1288, JAMES (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00532 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00532 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Floor: HB 389 PN 1474, FP (Y: 187 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Floor: HB 389 PN 1236, 2015 A1288, JAMES (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00532 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00532 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Senate | Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE |
2015-05-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-05-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (187-6) |
2015-05-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-05-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-05-06 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-05-05 | House | Removed from table |
2015-04-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-04-15 | House | First consideration |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to HEALTH |