PA HB386 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-21 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-21 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in powers and duties of the Department of Drug and Alcohol Programs, further providing for powers and duties.
Title
In powers and duties of the Department of Drug and Alcohol Programs, further providing for powers and duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-21 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-25 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2019-06-25 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |