PA HB385 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, further providing for classes of income; and making a related repeal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In personal income tax, further providing for classes of income; and making a related repeal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-26 - House - House Floor: HB 385 PN 3034, FP (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A04123 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-28SenateReferred to FINANCE
2022-04-26SenateIn the Senate
2022-04-26HouseThird consideration and final passage (203-0)
2022-04-26HouseRe-reported as amended
2022-04-26HouseAmended in House Committee on APPROPRIATIONS
2022-04-25HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2022-04-25HouseSecond consideration
2022-01-25HouseRemoved from table
2022-01-25HouseLaid on the table
2021-10-27HouseRemoved from table
2021-10-27HouseLaid on the table
2021-06-23HouseRemoved from table
2021-06-23HouseLaid on the table
2021-05-03HouseRemoved from table
2021-05-03HouseLaid on the table
2021-02-05HouseRemoved from table
2021-02-04HouseLaid on the table
2021-02-04HouseFirst consideration
2021-02-04HouseReported as committed
2021-02-03HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=385
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0385&pn=0357
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0385&pn=3034
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0385P3034.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=02/04/2021&RollCallId=84
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/26/2022&RollCallId=1506
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/26/2022&RollCallId=1505
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=856

Bill Comments

feedback