PA HB384 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in licensing of drivers, further providing for classes of licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In licensing of drivers, further providing for classes of licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 384 PN 354, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor: HB 384 PN 354, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateAct No. 22
2019-06-28SenateApproved by the Governor
2019-06-18SenatePresented to the Governor
2019-06-18SenateSigned in Senate
2019-06-18SenateSigned in House
2019-06-17SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2019-06-12SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-03SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-03SenateSecond consideration
2019-04-10SenateFirst consideration
2019-04-10SenateReported as committed
2019-03-19SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2019-03-11SenateIn the Senate
2019-03-11HouseThird consideration and final passage (193-0)
2019-03-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-02-21HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-02-21HouseSecond consideration
2019-02-20HouseRemoved from table
2019-02-19HouseLaid on the table
2019-02-19HouseFirst consideration
2019-02-19HouseReported as committed
2019-02-05HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=384
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0384&pn=0354
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=02/19/2019&RollCallId=58
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=63
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/11/2019&RollCallId=102
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=04/10/2019&RollCallId=100
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/12/2019&RollCallId=302
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=127

Bill Comments

feedback