PA HB383 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-26 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-26 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 20 (Decedents, Estates and Fiduciaries) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in ownership of property and legal title and equitable estate, further providing for right to dispose of a decedent's remains.
Title
In ownership of property and legal title and equitable estate, further providing for right to dispose of a decedent's remains.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | House | Removed from table |
2018-09-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-06-05 | House | Removed from table |
2018-06-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-03-13 | House | Removed from table |
2018-03-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-11-21 | House | Removed from table |
2017-11-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-09-25 | House | Removed from table |
2017-09-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-09-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-07 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-07 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-07 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |