PA HB383 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 20 (Decedents, Estates and Fiduciaries) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in ownership of property and legal title and equitable estate, further providing for right to dispose of a decedent's remains.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In ownership of property and legal title and equitable estate, further providing for right to dispose of a decedent's remains.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-07 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-26HouseRemoved from table
2018-09-26HouseLaid on the table
2018-06-05HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-05HouseLaid on the table
2018-03-13HouseRemoved from table
2018-03-13HouseLaid on the table
2017-11-21HouseRemoved from table
2017-11-21HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-25HouseRemoved from table
2017-09-08HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-07HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-07HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-07HouseReported as committed
2017-02-07HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback