PA HB375 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-8)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-8)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of August 26, 1971 (P.L.351, No.91), known as the State Lottery Law, in pharmaceutical assistance for the elderly, further providing for definitions.
Title
In pharmaceutical assistance for the elderly, further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 375 PN 348, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Floor: HB 375 PN 348, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Floor: HB 375 PN 348, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | Senate | Act No. 82 |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Signed in House |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2019-10-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-03 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |
2019-05-14 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-05-14 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2019-05-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-05-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-13 | House | Second consideration |
2019-05-07 | House | Removed from table |
2019-03-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-03-27 | House | First consideration |
2019-03-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |