PA HB372 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-11 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 24, 1931 (P.L.1206, No.331), known as The First Class Township Code, further providing for suits and property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for suits and property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-07 - House - HB 372 PN 337, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-11SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2011-03-07SenateIn the Senate
2011-03-07HouseThird consideration and final passage (193-0)
2011-03-07HouseRe-reported as committed
2011-03-01HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2011-03-01HouseSecond consideration
2011-02-16HouseRemoved from table
2011-02-15HouseLaid on the table
2011-02-15HouseFirst consideration
2011-02-15HouseReported as committed
2011-02-01HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback