PA HB372 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-03 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An Act amending the act of July 19, 1979 (P.L.130, No.48), known as the Health Care Facilities Act, in licensing of health care facilities, further providing for definitions; and providing for complaint investigations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In licensing of health care facilities, further providing for definitions; and providing for complaint investigations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-03-30 - House - HB 372 PN 390, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-08-03 Laid on the table
2009-07-14 Re-reported as committed
2009-07-07 Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2009-06-17 First consideration
2009-06-17 Reported as committed
2009-04-02 Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE
2009-03-30 In the Senate
2009-03-30 Third consideration and final passage
2009-03-25 Second consideration
2009-03-25 Re-reported as committed
2009-03-25 Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2009-03-24 Removed from table
2009-03-23 Laid on the table
2009-03-23 First consideration
2009-03-23 Reported as committed
2009-02-10 Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback