PA HB371 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-26 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-26 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating the portion of Pennsylvania Route 837, also known as Duquesne Boulevard, between Center Street in the City of Duquesne, Allegheny County, and Hoffman Boulevard in West Mifflin Borough, Allegheny County, as the Clifton P. Pitts Memorial Highway.
Title
Designating the portion of Pennsylvania Route 837, also known as Duquesne Boulevard, between Center Street in the City of Duquesne, Allegheny County, and Hoffman Boulevard in West Mifflin Borough, Allegheny County, as the Clifton P. Pitts Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-26 | House | Removed from table |
2022-10-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-28 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-25 | House | Removed from table |
2022-04-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-10 | House | Removed from table |
2022-01-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-10-05 | House | Removed from table |
2021-10-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-15 | House | Removed from table |
2021-06-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-08 | House | Removed from table |
2021-03-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-03-23 | House | First consideration |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |