PA HB369 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 40-21)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 21
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 21
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 24, 1976 (P.L.424, No.101), referred to as the Emergency and Law Enforcement Personnel Death Benefits Act, further providing for the payment of death benefits to members of emergency personnel teams.
Title
An Act amending the act of June 24, 1976 (P.L.424, No.101), referred to as the Emergency and Law Enforcement Personnel Death Benefits Act, further providing for the payment of death benefits to members of emergency personnel teams.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-07-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2007-06-30 | Presented to the Governor | |
2007-06-30 | Signed in Senate | |
2007-06-30 | Signed in House | |
2007-06-30 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-06-29 | Second consideration | |
2007-06-28 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-27 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-06-26 | First consideration | |
2007-06-26 | Reported as committed | |
2007-05-09 | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS | |
2007-05-07 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-05-07 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-04-30 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-04-25 | Second consideration | |
2007-04-24 | Removed from table | |
2007-04-23 | Laid on the table | |
2007-04-23 | First consideration | |
2007-04-23 | Reported as amended | |
2007-02-13 | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=369 |