PA HB365 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, making editorial changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making editorial changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Floor: HB 365 PN 337, FP (Y: 200 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-22SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2021-03-22SenateIn the Senate
2021-03-22HouseThird consideration and final passage (200-1)
2021-03-22HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-03-17HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-03-17HouseSecond consideration
2021-03-16HouseRemoved from table
2021-03-11HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-11HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-11HouseReported as committed
2021-02-03HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback