PA HB355 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, providing for advertising; and, in charter schools, further providing for definitions, for charter school requirements and for powers of board of trustees and providing for fund balance limits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, providing for advertising; and, in charter schools, further providing for definitions, for charter school requirements and for powers of board of trustees and providing for fund balance limits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 355 PN 2110, FP (Y: 189 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 355 PN 1744, 2019 A1824, STURLA (Y: 90 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 355 PN 1744, 2019 A1822, MCCARTER (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 355 PN 1744, 2019 A1374, CIRESI (Y: 93 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 355 PN 1744, 2019 A1373, CIRESI (Y: 92 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 355 PN 1744, 2019 A1563, ROEBUCK (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 355 PN 1744, 2019 A1711, MOT APPEAL CHAIR, LONGIETTI (Y: 107 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A01298 (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-13 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A01297 (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2019-06-12SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (189-7)
2019-06-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-11HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-11HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-06-10HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-13HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-13HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-13HouseReported as committed
2019-05-07HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=355
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0355&pn=1744
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0355&pn=2110
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=05/13/2019&RollCallId=489
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=05/13/2019&RollCallId=490
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=05/13/2019&RollCallId=491
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=413
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=414
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=415
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=416
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=417
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=418
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=430
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/12/2019&RollCallId=764

Bill Comments

feedback