PA HB353 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-10)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 96
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 14, 1972 (P.L.233, No.64), known as The Controlled Substance, Drug, Device and Cosmetic Act, further providing for definitions and for professional prescription, administration, and dispensing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions and for professional prescription, administration, and dispensing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-17 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 353 PN 3779, CONCUR (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 353 PN 3779, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 353 PN 2066, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 353 PN 2066, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, REED (Y: 174 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - House - House Floor: HB 353 PN 1911, 2017 A1830, WARD (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A01628 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-24HouseAct No. 96
2018-10-24HouseApproved by the Governor
2018-10-17HousePresented to the Governor
2018-10-17HouseSigned in Senate
2018-10-17HouseSigned in House
2018-10-17HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (187-0)
2018-10-17HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-10-17HouseReferred to RULES
2018-10-16HouseIn the House
2018-10-16SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-09-24SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-06-21SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-21SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-20SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-20SenateReported as amended
2017-06-23SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2017-06-20SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (194-0)
2017-06-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-19HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-19HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-06-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-06HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-06HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-06HouseReported as amended
2017-02-06HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=353
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0353&pn=0365
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0353&pn=1911
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0353&pn=2066
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0353&pn=3779
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=06/06/2017&RollCallId=477
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=06/06/2017&RollCallId=478
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=501
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/19/2017&RollCallId=669
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=513
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=514
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/20/2017&RollCallId=677
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=06/20/2018&RollCallId=1005
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=09/24/2018&RollCallId=1070
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=695
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1593
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=10/17/2018&RollCallId=2098

Bill Comments

feedback