PA HB349 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of November 10, 1999 (P.L.491, No.45), known as the Pennsylvania Construction Code Act, in adoption and enforcement by municipalities, further providing for administration and enforcement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In adoption and enforcement by municipalities, further providing for administration and enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Floor: HB 349 PN 1129, FP (Y: 114 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor: HB 349 PN 1087, 2019 A541, FREEMAN (Y: 88 N: 103 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor: HB 349 PN 1087, 2019 A538, HEFFLEY (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2019-04-08SenateIn the Senate
2019-04-08HouseThird consideration and final passage (114-84)
2019-04-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-03-27HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-27HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-03-26HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-25HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-25HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-25HouseReported as amended
2019-02-01HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=349
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0349&pn=0326
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0349&pn=1087
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0349&pn=1129
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=03/25/2019&RollCallId=174
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=03/25/2019&RollCallId=175
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=133
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=134
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=154
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/08/2019&RollCallId=246

Bill Comments

feedback