PA HB333 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-30 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-19 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A03114 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-30HouseRemoved from table
2020-09-30HouseLaid on the table
2020-07-07HouseRemoved from table
2020-07-07HouseLaid on the table
2020-05-12HouseRemoved from table
2020-05-12HouseLaid on the table
2020-03-24HouseRemoved from table
2020-02-04HouseLaid on the table
2020-02-04HouseRemoved from table
2019-11-19HouseLaid on the table
2019-11-19HouseFirst consideration
2019-11-19HouseReported as amended
2019-06-11HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback