PA HB333 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 39-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Floor: HB 333 PN 1710, FP (Y: 169 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Floor: HB 333 PN 357, 2017 A1201, NELSON (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A01004 (Y: 7 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A01001 (Y: 8 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11SenateReferred to FINANCE
2018-04-09SenateIn the Senate
2018-04-09HouseThird consideration and final passage (169-24)
2018-04-09HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-05-10HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-05-10HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-05-08HouseRemoved from table
2017-04-25HouseLaid on the table
2017-04-25HouseFirst consideration
2017-04-25HouseReported as committed
2017-02-06HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=333
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0333&pn=0357
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0333&pn=1710
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=04/25/2017&RollCallId=304
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=04/25/2017&RollCallId=305
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=04/25/2017&RollCallId=310
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=339
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1057
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/09/2018&RollCallId=1361

Bill Comments 750

feedback