PA HB333 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on December 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-22 - Act No. 126
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An Act amending the act of October 5, 1978 (P.L.1109, No.261), known as the Osteopathic Medical Practice Act, further providing for definitions; and providing for regulation of genetic counselors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions; and providing for regulation of genetic counselors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-12-15 - House - HB 333 PN 2875, CONCUR (Y: 177 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-12-14 - Senate - HB 333 PN 2875, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-12 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-25 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - House - HB 333 PN 1445, FP (Y: 166 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-12-22HouseAct No. 126
2011-12-22HouseApproved by the Governor
2011-12-22HousePresented to the Governor
2011-12-22HouseSigned in Senate
2011-12-15HouseSigned in House
2011-12-15HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (177-14)
2011-12-15HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2011-12-14HouseReferred to RULES
2011-12-14HouseIn the House
2011-12-14SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2011-12-13SenateSecond consideration
2011-12-12SenateRe-reported as amended
2011-11-01SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2011-10-25SenateFirst consideration
2011-10-25SenateReported as amended
2011-05-06SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2011-05-02SenateIn the Senate
2011-05-02HouseThird consideration and final passage (166-28)
2011-05-02HouseRe-reported as committed
2011-04-27HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2011-04-27HouseSecond consideration
2011-04-26HouseRemoved from table
2011-04-06HouseLaid on the table
2011-04-06HouseFirst consideration
2011-04-06HouseReported as amended
2011-01-31HouseReferred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2011&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=333
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0333&pn=0288
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0333&pn=1445
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0333&pn=2632
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0333&pn=2875
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=262
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2011&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=7&theDate=10/25/2011&rNbr=589
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2011&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=12/12/2011&rNbr=713
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=459
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1011

Bill Comments 750

feedback