PA HB332 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-10-26 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A01002 (Y: 0 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-26HouseRemoved from table
2017-10-26HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-12HouseRemoved from table
2017-09-12HouseLaid on the table
2017-06-21HouseRemoved from table
2017-06-21HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-08HouseRemoved from table
2017-04-25HouseLaid on the table
2017-04-25HouseFirst consideration
2017-04-25HouseReported as committed
2017-02-06HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback