PA HB330 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on February 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-12 - Act No. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on February 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-12 - Act No. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 27, 2006 (1st Sp.Sess., P.L.1873, No.1), known as the Taxpayer Relief Act, making editorial changes to incorrect references.
Title
Making editorial changes to incorrect references.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 330 PN 883, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Floor: HB 330 PN 883, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A00134 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Floor: HB 330 PN 883, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A00134 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | Act No. 5 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Signed in House |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Removed from table |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-10 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2019-03-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2019-03-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-03-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-03-19 | House | Second consideration |
2019-03-18 | House | Removed from table |
2019-03-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-03-13 | House | First consideration |
2019-03-13 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to FINANCE |