PA HB328 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing the Flood Insurance Premium Assistance Task Force.
Title
Establishing the Flood Insurance Premium Assistance Task Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - House - House Floor: HB 328 PN 952, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A00288 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A00288 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
2019-04-29 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-04-29 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2019-03-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-03-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-03-26 | House | Second consideration |
2019-03-25 | House | Removed from table |
2019-03-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-03-18 | House | First consideration |
2019-03-18 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |