PA HB327 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Act No. 21
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in licenses and regulations, liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, providing for prepared beverages and mixed drinks for off-premises consumption during disaster emergency and reenacting provisions relating to local option.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in licenses and regulations, liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, providing for prepared beverages and mixed drinks for off-premises consumption during disaster emergency and reenacting provisions relating to local option.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 327 PN 3678, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Floor: HB 327 PN 3678, FP (Y: 193 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Floor: HB 327 PN 3658, 2019 A5350, WARREN (Y: 128 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - House - House Floor: HB 327 PN 305, 2019 A5282, MASSER (Y: 193 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21SenateAct No. 21
2020-05-21SenateApproved by the Governor
2020-05-18SenatePresented to the Governor
2020-05-18SenateSigned in Senate
2020-05-14SenateSigned in House
2020-05-13SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2020-05-12SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-05-12SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-05-12SenateSecond consideration
2020-05-11SenateFirst consideration
2020-05-11SenateReported as committed
2020-05-06SenateReferred to LAW AND JUSTICE
2020-04-29SenateIn the Senate
2020-04-29HouseFinal passage (193-9)
2020-04-29HouseThird consideration, with amendments
2020-04-29HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-04-28HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-04-28HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2020-03-25HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-29HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-29HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-11HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-11HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-11HouseReported as committed
2019-02-01HouseReferred to LIQUOR CONTROL

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=327
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0327&pn=0305
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0327&pn=3658
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0327&pn=3678
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=03/11/2019&RollCallId=64
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1216
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1233
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1234
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/29/2020&RollCallId=1905
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=29&theDate=05/11/2020&RollCallId=845
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=05/12/2020&RollCallId=857
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=459

Bill Comments

feedback