PA HB326 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 55-5)
Status: Passed on March 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Act No. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in the Governor as Commander-in-Chief, further providing for active duty for emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In the Governor as Commander-in-Chief, further providing for active duty for emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 326 PN 388, Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 326 PN 388, Agree to the bill on Second Consideration (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Floor: HB 326 PN 388, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Floor: HB 326 PN 301, 2021 A284, O'NEAL (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03SenateAct No. 4
2021-03-03SenateApproved by the Governor
2021-02-26SenatePresented to the Governor
2021-02-26SenateSigned in House
2021-02-24SenateSigned in Senate
2021-02-24SenateThird consideration and final passage (46-0)
2021-02-23SenateRe-reported as committed
2021-02-23SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-02-23SenateSecond consideration (46-0)
2021-02-22SenateFirst consideration
2021-02-22SenateReported as committed
2021-02-05SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2021-02-05SenateIn the Senate
2021-02-05HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2021-02-05HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-02-04HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-02-04HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-02-03HouseRemoved from table
2021-02-03HouseLaid on the table
2021-02-03HouseFirst consideration
2021-02-03HouseReported as committed
2021-01-28HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=326
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0326&pn=0301
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0326&pn=0388
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2021&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=0326&pn=0301&aYear=2021&an=00284
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0326P0388.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2021/0/HB0326P0388.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=02/03/2021&RollCallId=67
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=02/03/2021&RollCallId=68
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=25
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=37
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/05/2021&RollCallId=107
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=21&theDate=02/22/2021&RollCallId=25
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=37
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=02/23/2021&RollCallId=42
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=46

Bill Comments

feedback