PA HB326 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Act No. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Act No. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of August 9, 1955 (P.L.323, No.130), known as The County Code, further providing for the governing board of the convention center authority.
Title
Further providing for the governing board of the convention center authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Florindo Fabrizio [D] | Rep. Ryan Bizzarro [D] | Rep. Patrick Harkins [D] | Rep. Gregory Lucas [R] |
Rep. Curtis Sonney [R] | Rep. Thomas Caltagirone [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - Senate - HB 326 PN 1130, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-17 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - HB 326 PN 1130, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-17 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - HB 326 PN 1130, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Senate | Act No. 27 |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Signed in House |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2013-04-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-04-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2013-04-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-04-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-04-08 | House | Second consideration |
2013-03-18 | House | Removed from table |
2013-03-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-03-13 | House | First consideration |
2013-03-13 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |