PA HB325 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 63 (Professions and Occupations (State Licensed)) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in powers and duties, further providing for civil penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In powers and duties, further providing for civil penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Floor: HB 325 PN 299, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2021-03-24SenateIn the Senate
2021-03-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-03-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-03-22HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-03-22HouseSecond consideration
2021-03-17HouseRemoved from table
2021-03-15HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-15HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-15HouseReported as committed
2021-01-28HouseReferred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback