PA HB321 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 84-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in abortion, further providing for definitions and for medical consultation and judgment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In abortion, further providing for definitions and for medical consultation and judgment.

Sponsors

Rep. Kate Klunk [R]Rep. Michael Turzai [R]Rep. Stephen Barrar [R]Rep. Aaron Bernstine [R]
Rep. Karen Boback [R]Rep. Stephanie Borowicz [R]Rep. Robert Brooks [R]Rep. Rosemary Brown [R]
Rep. Frank Burns [D]Rep. Martin Causer [R]Rep. Donald Cook [R]Rep. Jim Cox [R]
Rep. Lynda Schlegel Culver [R]Rep. Bryan Cutler [R]Rep. Gary Day [R]Rep. Russ Diamond [R]
Rep. Matthew Dowling [R]Rep. George Dunbar [R]Rep. Cris Dush [R]Rep. Torren Ecker [R]
Rep. Joseph Emrick [R]Rep. Garth Everett [R]Rep. Melinda Fee [R]Rep. Jonathan Fritz [R]
Rep. Mark Gillen [R]Rep. Keith Gillespie [R]Rep. Barbara Gleim [R]Rep. James Gregory [R]
Rep. Keith Greiner [R]Rep. Seth Grove [R]Rep. Marcia Hahn [R]Rep. Doyle Heffley [R]
Rep. Susan Helm [R]Rep. Timothy Hennessey [R]Rep. Johnathan Hershey [R]Rep. David Hickernell [R]
Rep. Rich Irvin [R]Rep. Robert James [R]Rep. Mike Jones [R]Rep. Barry Jozwiak [R]
Rep. Joshua Kail [R]Rep. Robert Kauffman [R]Rep. Dawn Keefer [R]Rep. Mark Keller [R]
Rep. Jerome Knowles [R]Rep. Anita Kulik [D]Rep. John Lawrence [R]Rep. Andrew Lewis [R]
Rep. David Maloney [R]Rep. James Marshall [R]Rep. Kurt Masser [R]Rep. Thomas Mehaffie [R]
Rep. Steven Mentzer [R]Rep. Daryl Metcalfe [R]Rep. David Millard [R]Rep. Brett Miller [R]
Rep. Dan Moul [R]Rep. Thomas Murt [R]Rep. Eric Nelson [R]Rep. Tedd Nesbit [R]
Rep. Timothy O'Neal [R]Rep. Donna Oberlander [R]Rep. Jason Ortitay [R]Rep. Clinton Owlett [R]
Rep. Michael Peifer [R]Rep. Tina Pickett [R]Rep. Jack Rader [R]Rep. Kathy Rapp [R]
Rep. Harry Readshaw [D]Rep. Michael Reese [R]Rep. James Rigby [R]Rep. Bradley Roae [R]
Rep. Greg Rothman [R]Rep. Francis Ryan [R]Rep. Thomas Sankey [R]Rep. Stanley Saylor [R]
Rep. Paul Schemel [R]Rep. Louis Schmitt [R]Rep. Craig Staats [R]Rep. James Struzzi [R]
Rep. Jesse Topper [R]Rep. Justin Walsh [R]Rep. Ryan Warner [R]Rep. Parke Wentling [R]
Rep. Jeff Wheeland [R]Rep. David Zimmerman [R]Rep. Lori Mizgorski [R]

Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Floor: HB 321 PN 1404, FP (Y: 117 N: 76 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Floor: HB 321 PN 1404, MOT CONST, FRANKEL (Y: 115 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Floor: HB 321 PN 1404, MOT RECON, FRANKEL (Y: 89 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - House - House Floor: HB 321 PN 1404, 2019 A1245, MOT APPEAL CHAIR, DERMODY (Y: 108 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Floor: HB 321 PN 1404, 2019 A1179, MOT APPEAL CHAIR, DERMODY (Y: 108 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2019-05-14SenateIn the Senate
2019-05-14HouseThird consideration and final passage (117-76)
2019-05-14HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-05-08HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-08HouseSecond consideration
2019-05-07HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-06HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-06HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-06HouseReported as committed
2019-04-15HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=321
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0321&pn=1404
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=05/06/2019&RollCallId=423
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=289
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=290
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=295
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=314
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=315
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/14/2019&RollCallId=554

Bill Comments

feedback