PA HB318 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-14)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 4, 1996 (P.L.911, No.147), known as the Telemarketer Registration Act, further providing for definitions, for unlawful acts and penalties, for blocking of caller identification and other telemarketing screening products or services prohibited and for unwanted telephone solicitation calls prohibited.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions, for unlawful acts and penalties, for blocking of caller identification and other telemarketing screening products or services prohibited and for unwanted telephone solicitation calls prohibited.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Floor: HB 318 PN 544, FP (Y: 174 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Floor: HB 318, 2019 A59, FARRY (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Floor: HB 318, 2019 A59, SUSP RULES, FARRY (Y: 189 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25SenateRemoved from table
2019-06-25SenateLaid on the table
2019-06-03SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-05-06SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-06SenateSecond consideration
2019-05-01SenateFirst consideration
2019-05-01SenateReported as committed
2019-02-26SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2019-02-20SenateIn the Senate
2019-02-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (174-0)
2019-02-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-02-19HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-02-19HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-02-06HouseRemoved from table
2019-02-04HouseLaid on the table
2019-02-04HouseFirst consideration
2019-02-04HouseReported as committed
2019-02-01HouseReferred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=318
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0318&pn=0275
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0318&pn=0544
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=10&theDate=02/04/2019&RollCallId=9
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=32
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=33
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=37
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/20/2019&RollCallId=41
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=7&theDate=05/01/2019&RollCallId=142
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/03/2019&RollCallId=194

Bill Comments

feedback