PA HB317 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 43-14)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-08 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-08 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for sentencing procedure for murder of the first degree.
Title
Further providing for sentencing procedure for murder of the first degree.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - House - HB 317 PN 918, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - HB 317 PN 918, 2011 A931, CONKLIN (Y: 80 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2011-03-09 - House - HB 317 PN 918, 2011 A931, CONKLIN (Y: 80 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-08 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2011-04-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-04-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2011-04-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-03-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-03-09 | House | Second consideration |
2011-03-08 | House | Removed from table |
2011-03-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-03-01 | House | First consideration |
2011-03-01 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-01-31 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |