PA HB316 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-10)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Act No. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-10)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Act No. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in Commonwealth agency fees, further providing for the Department of Health; and providing for children's advocacy centers.
Title
In Commonwealth agency fees, further providing for the Department of Health; and providing for children's advocacy centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-17 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - HB 316 PN 324, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - HB 316 PN 324, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | Act No. 28 |
2014-04-07 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-04-01 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-03-31 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-03-31 | House | Signed in House |
2014-03-31 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (197-5) |
2014-03-31 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-03-19 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-03-19 | House | In the House |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (46-0) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-03-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |
2013-02-12 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-02-12 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2013-02-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-02-11 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-02-11 | House | Second consideration |
2013-02-07 | House | Removed from table |
2013-02-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-02-06 | House | First consideration |
2013-02-06 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-02-04 | House | Re-referred to JUDICIARY |
2013-02-04 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to JUDICIARY |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |