PA HB315 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Passed on October 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-07 - Act No. 44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Passed on October 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-07 - Act No. 44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 24, 2012 (P.L.1209, No.151), known as the Child Labor Act, further providing for definitions and for occupations and establishments.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for occupations and establishments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 315 PN 322, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Floor: HB 315 PN 322, FP (Y: 194 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Floor: HB 315 PN 322, FP (Y: 194 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-07 | Senate | Act No. 44 |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2015-09-21 | Senate | Signed in House |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-06-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2015-03-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-1) |
2015-03-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-03-03 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-03-03 | House | Second consideration |
2015-03-02 | House | Removed from table |
2015-02-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-02-11 | House | First consideration |
2015-02-11 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |