PA HB305 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-13)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-28 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for an inventory of State-owned assets and county-owned assets for the development of mobile broadband services in unserved areas and underserved areas of this Commonwealth and for the Statewide Mobile Radio and Microwave System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for an inventory of State-owned assets and county-owned assets for the development of mobile broadband services in unserved areas and underserved areas of this Commonwealth and for the Statewide Mobile Radio and Microwave System.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 305 PN 2210, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 305 PN 1737, 2019 A2180, JOZWIAK (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 305 PN 1737, 2019 A2180, SUSP RULES, JOZWIAK (Y: 191 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00908 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00645 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-28SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-09-25SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-09-25SenateSecond consideration
2019-09-24SenateFirst consideration
2019-09-24SenateReported as amended
2019-06-21SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2019-06-20SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-20HouseFinal passage (192-0)
2019-06-20HouseThird consideration, with amendments
2019-06-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-19HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-12HouseSecond consideration
2019-06-11HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-06HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-06HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-06HouseReported as amended
2019-02-01HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=305
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0305&pn=0285
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0305&pn=1737
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0305&pn=2210
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0305&pn=2574
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=05/06/2019&RollCallId=449
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=05/06/2019&RollCallId=450
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=05/06/2019&RollCallId=451
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=526
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=527
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=528
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/20/2019&RollCallId=868
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=09/24/2019&RollCallId=509
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/28/2019&RollCallId=572

Bill Comments

feedback