PA HB302 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in professional and occupational licenses, further providing for retention of licenses and certifications of persons entering military service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In professional and occupational licenses, further providing for retention of licenses and certifications of persons entering military service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 302 PN 302, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-16SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2017-06-13SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-13HouseThird consideration and final passage (188-0)
2017-06-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-12HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-12HouseSecond consideration
2017-06-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-06HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-06HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-06HouseReported as committed
2017-02-03HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=302
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0302&pn=0302
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=06/06/2017&RollCallId=480
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=485
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=586
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/12/2017&RollCallId=605

Bill Comments

feedback