PA HB30 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Passed on November 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-25 - Act No. 115
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 20 (Decedents, Estates and Fiduciaries) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in anatomical gifts, further providing for The Governor Robert P. Casey Memorial Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Trust Fund contributions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In anatomical gifts, further providing for The Governor Robert P. Casey Memorial Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Trust Fund contributions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-19 - House - House Floor: HB 30 PN 3853, CONCUR (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-19 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 30 PN 3853, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Floor: HB 30 PN 365, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-25HouseAct No. 115
2020-11-25HouseApproved by the Governor
2020-11-20HousePresented to the Governor
2020-11-19HouseSigned in Senate
2020-11-19HouseSigned in House
2020-11-19HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (202-0)
2020-11-19HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-11-18HouseReferred to RULES
2020-11-17HouseIn the House
2020-11-17SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2020-09-21SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-06-23SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-06-23SenateSecond consideration
2020-05-26SenateFirst consideration
2020-05-26SenateReported as amended
2019-04-22SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2019-04-15SenateIn the Senate
2019-04-15HouseThird consideration and final passage (198-0)
2019-03-27HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-03-26HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-26HouseSecond consideration
2019-03-25HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-18HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-18HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-18HouseReported as committed
2019-02-06HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=30
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0030&pn=0365
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0030&pn=3853
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=03/18/2019&RollCallId=167
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/27/2019&RollCallId=213
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=181
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=05/26/2020&RollCallId=870
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=09/21/2020&RollCallId=1143
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=738
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=11/19/2020&RollCallId=2645
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1750

Bill Comments

feedback