PA HB297 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-01 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of August 15, 1961 (P.L.987, No.442), known as the Pennsylvania Prevailing Wage Act, further providing for definitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-24 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-01HouseLaid on the table
2018-10-01HouseFirst consideration
2018-10-01HouseReported as committed
2017-02-02HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback