PA HB297 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-19 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-19 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for release of information by coroners and medical examiners.
Title
Providing for release of information by coroners and medical examiners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-19 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House Floor: HB 297 PN 1049, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Floor: HB 297 PN 481, 2015 A415, FABRIZIO (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Floor: HB 297 PN 481, 2015 A280, FABRIZIO (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00106 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00105 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00105 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00106 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House Floor: HB 297 PN 1049, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Floor: HB 297 PN 481, 2015 A415, FABRIZIO (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Floor: HB 297 PN 481, 2015 A280, FABRIZIO (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00106 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00105 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00105 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00106 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-10-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-04-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-04-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2015-04-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-03-31 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-03-31 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-03-30 | House | Removed from table |
2015-02-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-02-10 | House | First consideration |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to HEALTH |