PA HB296 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-16)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, providing for adoption and foster care tax credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for adoption and foster care tax credit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 296 PN 269, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Floor: HB 296 PN 269, 2019 A1576, D. MILLER (Y: 87 N: 109 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08SenateReferred to FINANCE
2019-06-27SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-27HouseThird consideration and final passage (200-0)
2019-06-27HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-04HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-04HouseSecond consideration
2019-06-03HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-01HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-01HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-13HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-13HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-13HouseReported as committed
2019-01-30HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=296
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0296&pn=0269
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=03/13/2019&RollCallId=90
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=342
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=608
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/27/2019&RollCallId=979

Bill Comments

feedback