PA HB296 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-17 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of August 26, 1971 (P.L.351, No.91), known as the State Lottery Law, in pharmaceutical assistance for the elderly, further providing for the definition of "income."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In pharmaceutical assistance for the elderly, further providing for the definition of "income."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 296 PN 290, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-17SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2018-06-21SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-21SenateReported as committed
2017-05-31SenateReferred to AGING AND YOUTH
2017-05-24SenateIn the Senate
2017-05-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (192-0)
2017-05-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-05-23HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-05-23HouseSecond consideration
2017-05-22HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-10HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-10HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-10HouseReported as committed
2017-02-02HouseReferred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=296
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0296&pn=0290
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=32&theDate=05/10/2017&RollCallId=399
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=385
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/24/2017&RollCallId=451
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=1&theDate=06/21/2018&RollCallId=1029

Bill Comments

feedback