PA HB293 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-01-12 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, providing for compensable services and items; and abrogating a related regulation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In public assistance, providing for compensable services and items; and abrogating a related regulation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - House - House Floor: HB 293 PN 1829, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Floor: HB 293 PN 259, 2021 A1556, FRANKEL (Y: 199 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Human Services: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-12SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2022-01-11SenateIn the Senate
2022-01-11HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2022-01-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-06-15HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-15HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-06-15HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-06-09HouseRe-committed to RULES
2021-06-09HouseFirst consideration
2021-06-09HouseReported as committed
2021-04-06HouseRe-referred to HEALTH
2021-04-06HouseReported with request to re-refer to HEALTH
2021-01-27HouseReferred to HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=293
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0293&pn=0259
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0293&pn=1829
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0293P1829.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=56&theDate=04/06/2021&RollCallId=276
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=06/09/2021&RollCallId=574
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/15/2021&RollCallId=630
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=335
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=699
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=01/11/2022&RollCallId=1225

Bill Comments

feedback