PA HB291 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-8)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in inheritance tax, further providing for inheritance tax rate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In inheritance tax, further providing for inheritance tax rate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Floor: HB 291 PN 285, FP (Y: 176 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2018-01-31SenateFirst consideration
2018-01-31SenateReported as committed
2017-04-06SenateReferred to FINANCE
2017-04-04SenateIn the Senate
2017-04-04HouseThird consideration and final passage (176-21)
2017-04-04HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-03-22HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-03-22HouseSecond consideration
2017-03-21HouseRemoved from table
2017-03-21HouseLaid on the table
2017-03-21HouseFirst consideration
2017-03-21HouseReported as committed
2017-02-02HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=291
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0291&pn=0285
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=03/21/2017&RollCallId=104
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=125
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/04/2017&RollCallId=203
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=25&theDate=01/31/2018&RollCallId=668

Bill Comments

feedback