PA HB290 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-8)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 19, 1988 (P.L.1262, No.156), known as the Local Option Small Games of Chance Act, in miscellaneous provisions, providing for games of chance operations during COVID-19 disaster emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In miscellaneous provisions, providing for games of chance operations during COVID-19 disaster emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Floor: HB 290 PN 1157, FP (Y: 193 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Floor: HB 290 PN 1049, 2021 A637, ROZZI (Y: 187 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Floor: HB 290 PN 1049, 2021 A635, ROZZI (Y: 183 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Adopt Amendment A00496 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateReferred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
2021-04-07SenateIn the Senate
2021-04-07HouseThird consideration and final passage (193-8)
2021-04-07HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-04-06HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-04-06HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-04-05HouseRemoved from table
2021-03-24HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-24HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-24HouseReported as amended
2021-01-27HouseReferred to GAMING OVERSIGHT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=290
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0290&pn=0256
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0290&pn=1049
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0290&pn=1157
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0290P1157.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=54&theDate=03/24/2021&RollCallId=230
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=54&theDate=03/24/2021&RollCallId=229
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=127
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=128
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=143
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/07/2021&RollCallId=284

Bill Comments

feedback